Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 840 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4353 Week
» 24646 Month
» 202550 Year
» 1867926 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7412 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77412 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3035 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63035 w/e 21/08/1948
British Railways 90035 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25283
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
36C   Frodingham w/e 11/09/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK EFD Eastfield w/e 09/03/1946
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC MAR March on 28/11/1946
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 5w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Works Yard) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7412
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25283
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77412    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3035    
21/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63035    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90035    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90035    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev