Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 785 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2466 Week
» 22759 Month
» 200663 Year
» 1866039 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7413 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77413 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90286 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25284
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Wed 15/08/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
36A   Doncaster w/e 10/12/1960
     Withdrawn on 15/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK ANN Annesley on 24/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 31/12/1960
WDN   on 15/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7413
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25284
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77413    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90286    
10/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
15/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90286    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev