Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 147 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3660 Week
» 23953 Month
» 201857 Year
» 1867233 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7414 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77414 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90287 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25285
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 19 yrs , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
38A   Colwick w/e 24/11/1951
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
40E   Colwick w/e 07/05/1960
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK MAR March on 19/04/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 24/11/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7414
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25285
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77414    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90287    
24/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90287    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston    

prev prev