Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 778 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2459 Week
» 22752 Month
» 200656 Year
» 1866032 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7415 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77415 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90288 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25286
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
MAR   March (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 28/11/1947
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/07/1953
40B   Immingham w/e 16/04/1960
40E   Colwick w/e 13/08/1960
36C   Frodingham w/e 15/10/1960
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 28/11/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 03/09/1960
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/10/1958 Colwich MPD - stored locomotives 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7415
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25286
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77415    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90288    
25/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
16/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90288    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev