Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 820 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2501 Week
» 22794 Month
» 200698 Year
» 1866074 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7416 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77416 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90289 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25287
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 21/11/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
26A   Newton Heath w/e 25/08/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 04/10/1958
8L   Aintree w/e 04/07/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 25/07/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 21/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STM St Margarets on 01/10/1947
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 04/09/1948
EXLOAN STM St Margarets on 29/10/1948
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 08/08/1964
WDN   w/e 21/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/09/1947 Stratford Works The following withdrawn locos. were noted in the vicinity of the stripping shop on 25/9: 'F3' 7118/21/29/38/45; 'B12/3' 1522; 'D16/3' 2500; 'J15' 5358 an 5403 (all stripped), whilst 7125 an 7148 were intact. Other locos. stripped were: 'J15' 5402/54; 'D16' 2535; 'J17' 5541/71. In the stripping shop were: 'E4' 2784; 'J15' 5472; 'J19/2' 4675 and 'J17' 5549. In the Paint shop were the 'Coffee Pot' 'Y5' 8081 and W.D. 77416. A curious sight was the crane tank shed filled by two W.D.'s 77119 an 77312 (the latter with a 15A shed plate). In the fields behind the New Works were 'F3' 7146; 'J70' 8225; 'H2' 7512; 'D16' 2591; 'B12' 1544 and 'J39' 4841, all awaiting works. W.D. 77476 was in the New Works, and W.D.'s 77302 and 77107 were in the shed yard. 'D16' 2584; 'J20' 4677/93; 'J39' 4708/61, 'J69' 8574/8632; 'F6' 7230 and 'F4' 7162 were all noted newly painted ex-works. 7162 was fitted with a tablet-catcher. SLS/194711

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7416
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25287
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77416    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90289    
25/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
21/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90289    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield    

prev prev