Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 836 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4349 Week
» 24642 Month
» 202546 Year
» 1867922 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7418 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77418 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90290 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25288
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/05/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
31B   March w/e 03/11/1951
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 19/01/1952
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 26/01/1952
35A   New England 4w/e 22/03/1952
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 19/04/1952
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 07/05/1960
41D   Canklow w/e 13/08/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 02/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN GOR Gorton on 27/02/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 23/03/1947
ALLOC BRN Barnsley on 27/04/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/05/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 31B March w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 35A New England 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 03/09/1960
WDN   w/e 02/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7418
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25288
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77418    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90290    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
19/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
02/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90290    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev