Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 777 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4290 Week
» 24583 Month
» 202487 Year
» 1867863 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7419 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77419 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90291 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25289
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/02/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
DFU   Dunfermline Upper w/e 05/11/1949
STM   St Margarets w/e 26/11/1949
64A   St Margarets 5w/e 24/12/1949
26A   Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
10F   Rose Grove w/e 04/07/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 06/02/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK STM St Margarets on 05/04/1947
LOAN 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 04/09/1948
EXLOAN STM St Margarets on 29/10/1948
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 26/11/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 5w/e 11/07/1964
WDN   w/e 06/02/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/05/1947 St Margarets MPD An unusual collection of locos. was observed at the old round-house on 10/5, comprising five ex N.B.R. 'Y9,' Nos. 8093, 8097, 8099, 8101, 8122 (all of which were remarkably clean), two ex G.E.R. 'J.69' Nos. 8562 and 8568, and one ex G.E.R. 'F7,' No. 7093. The latter having since been seen at Eastfield on 1/6, awaiting shop repairs. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 Nos. 77078, 77206, 77419 and 77494 were also on shed. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7419
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25289
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77419    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90291    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
26/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
04/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
06/02/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90291    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev