Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 767 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2448 Week
» 22741 Month
» 200645 Year
» 1866021 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7420 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77420 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3036 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63036 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90036 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25290
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 19/12/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
ANN   Annesley w/e 07/02/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/01/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) m/e 31/01/1951
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/03/1951
38A   Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
40B   Immingham 4w/e 13/09/1958
40E   Colwick w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 19/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 30/03/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 07/02/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 19/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop Yard) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Paint Shop) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7420
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25290
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77420    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3036    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63036 but not taken up    
07/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90036    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
19/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90036    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev