Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 812 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2493 Week
» 22786 Month
» 200690 Year
» 1866066 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7421 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77421 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90292 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25291
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/10/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
26B   Agecroft m/e 16/06/1956
9G   Gorton w/e 01/06/1963
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN SPM St Philips Marsh m/e 30/04/1947
ALLOC LA Laira m/e 31/08/1947
LOAN 25A Wakefield on 23/09/1949
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 9G Gorton 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 17/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7421
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25291
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77421    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90292    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
01/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
17/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90292    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev