Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 763 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2444 Week
» 22737 Month
» 200641 Year
» 1866017 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7422 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77422 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3037 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63037 w/e 15/05/1948
British Railways 90037 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25292
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 24/10/1953
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
40B   Immingham w/e 01/01/1966
36A   Doncaster w/e 12/02/1966
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK MAR March on 18/01/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 3w/e 01/01/1966
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 12/02/1966
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7422
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25292
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77422    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3037    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63037    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90037    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90037    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev