Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 138 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3651 Week
» 23944 Month
» 201848 Year
» 1867224 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7423 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77423 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3038 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63038 w/e 31/07/1948
British Railways 90038 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25293
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 01/08/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/09/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 01/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 09/03/1946
ALLOC STM St Margarets on 27/01/1947
LOAN 38A Colwick 4w/e 03/10/1953
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 15/09/1956
WDN   w/e 01/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
30/06/1950 Cowlairs Works Engines into shops: 1131, 1752, 3115, 4596, 4846, 4933, 5922, 5927, 7473, 8442, 8460, 8463, 8468, 8474, 8475, 8479, 9171, 61146, 61180, 61879, 61911, 62478, 62496, 62688, 63038, 63151, 64539, 64566, 64573, 64607, 64626, 64632, 64821, 64925, 64964, 67617, 68957, 69214, 69565, 77375, 77456, 90496. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7423
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25293
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77423    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3038    
31/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63038    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90038    
19/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90038    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev