Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 771 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4284 Week
» 24577 Month
» 202481 Year
» 1867857 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7424 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77424 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90293 m/e 09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25152
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
68A     on 19/06/1949
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 16/07/1949
DFU   Dunfermline Upper w/e 05/11/1949
31B   March w/e 10/02/1952
31B   March 5w/e 16/02/1952
31B   March 4w/e 22/03/1952
36A   Doncaster w/e 07/10/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK THJ Thornton Junction on 01/02/1947
ALLOC 68A   on 19/06/1949
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 31B March w/e 10/02/1952
ALLOC 31B March on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
18/03/1962 Gorton MPD On Shed ex-Works : 63704/64, 90293/305/68. SLS/196204
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7424
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25152
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77424    
19/06/1949 Allocation      
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
09/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90293    
10/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90293    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev