Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 827 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4340 Week
» 24633 Month
» 202537 Year
» 1867913 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7425 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77425 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90294 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25153
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/07/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
COL   Colchester w/e 13/03/1948
MAR   March w/e 08/05/1948
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 11/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 15/08/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 13/03/1948
ALLOC MAR March w/e 08/05/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/04/1947 Stonor Dump A visit to the 'dump' at Stonor on 14/4 found only six of the original 110 2-8-0 engines remaining. These were 77076, 77337, 77425, 77457, 78682 and 79184. Of these, 77457 would appear to be the next to leave, as it had been moved up near to the S.R. line, while 78682 does not appear to have moved from the position it occupied last June. All six were dirty, rusty and appeared to be in need of repair, and three of them (77076, 77337 and 79184) had had their builders' plates taken away. The Nissen type engine shed close by the main Ramsgate-Sandwich road was occupied by W.D. 0-6-0 ST. No. 75110, which was in steam. SLS/194706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7425
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25153
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77425    
13/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
08/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90294    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90294    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev