Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 127 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3640 Week
» 23933 Month
» 201837 Year
» 1867213 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7427 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77427 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3039 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63039 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90039 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25155
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal Fri 02/09/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1966 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 13/04/1957
65F   Grangemouth 4w/e 11/05/1957
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 12/04/1958
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 02/08/1958
62C   Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 07/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 02/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK WFD Woodford Halse on 06/03/1946
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   on 02/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7427
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25155
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77427    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3039    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63039 but not taken up    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90039    
13/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
11/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
12/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
02/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
07/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
02/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90039    
12/1966 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev