Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 313 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2014 Week
» 10129 Month
» 137572 Year
» 1802948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7429 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77429 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90297 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25156
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/09/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
26C   Bolton 4w/e 31/12/1950
27B   Aintree w/e 09/04/1960
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 17/06/1961
24B   Rose Grove w/e 06/04/1963
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 18/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 05/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEA Neasden m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC LLY Llanelly m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 27B Aintree 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 3w/e 01/02/1964
WDN   w/e 05/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1947 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during December included: Nos. 111, 823, 1007, 1017, 1760, 2280, 2830, 2873, 2902, 2940, 3810, 3856, 4013, 4036, 4062, 4702, 4705, 4854, 4946, 4947, 5024, 5072, 5073, 5092, 5939, 5966, 6310, 6312, 6329, 6350, 6374, 6397, 6866, 6901, 6921, 6938, 6948, 7001 and W.D. 77429. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 242, 905, 1713, 2781 an 3561. W.D. No. 73291 was ex Works on 11/12, having been fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and a Wakefield lubricator; the Westinghouse brake had been removed. No. 3215 has been fitted with a repaired R.O.D. tender and was ex Works on 12/12. SLS/194802
31/05/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. SLS/194807
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7429
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25156
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77429    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90297    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
06/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
18/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
05/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90297    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev