Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 862 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4375 Week
» 24668 Month
» 202572 Year
» 1867948 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7431 m/e 01/1944
War Dept. 77431 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90298 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25158
To Service During 01/1944
Withdrawal Mon 06/08/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Locomotive Works (Stratford)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1944
31B   March w/e 10/02/1952
31B   March 5w/e 16/02/1952
31B   March 4w/e 22/03/1952
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
31B   March 4w/e 22/09/1956
30A   Stratford 4w/e 16/02/1957
31B   March 5w/e 15/11/1958
30A   Stratford w/e 20/12/1958
33B   Tilbury w/e 23/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 06/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN EFD Eastfield on 11/09/1947
ALLOC 31B March w/e 10/02/1952
ALLOC 31B March on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 01/11/1958
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 06/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710
05/06/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7431
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25158
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77431    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90298    
10/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
20/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
06/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90298    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford    

prev prev