Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 820 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4333 Week
» 24626 Month
» 202530 Year
» 1867906 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7432 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77432 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90299 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25159
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
MAR   March (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 28/11/1947
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
STV   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 26/02/1949
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 22/01/1955
16A   Toton w/e 14/03/1964
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 18/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 28/11/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 29/01/1955
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963
ALLOC 16A Toton 4w/e 04/04/1964
WDN   w/e 25/04/1964
ALLOC 1G Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/05/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D100-2, 41254/65/73, 41325, 44872, 90173 and the usual preserved locos. Outside Paint Shop: D103/5, 44837/43, 45565, 49395, 90582. Works Sidings: 41222, 42114, 42283, 42569, 43200, 43605, 44731/64, 44906, 45150, 45226/53, 45417, 45507/84, 46130, 46227/45, 46410/43, 47513, 47625, 48262, 48435, 48603, 48895, 49431, 70050, 78021, 90033, 92107. Erecting Shop: D110-6, 41246/64, 42110/54/60/86, 42285, 42557, 42618, 44750/62, 44834/9/91, 44932, 45078, 45142/82, 45238/74, 45300/97, 45441, 45514/21/45, 45613/28/44/64/95, 45701/2/10/36, 46127/50/7/70, 46246/7, 46487, 46501, 48171, 48317/54, 48430/74, 48511, 48672, 49094, 78031/62, 90214/99, 90315, 90530, 90712, 92020/49. Outside Erecting Shop: 42584, 44937, 45014, 45681, 48418/31/44, 90555, 92124. New Erecting Shop: D106-9/17-9. Scrap Road: 40204, 40589, 43515, 43729, 43948, 44072, 44357, 44480, 47626/37, 58221, with 47190 just cut-up. Works Shunters: 12022, 43957, 44363, 44552, 47592, 51412, 52093, 52218, 52312, 52441. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7432
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25159
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77432    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90299    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
14/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90299    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev