Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 853 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2534 Week
» 22827 Month
» 200731 Year
» 1866107 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7433 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77433 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90300 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25160
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
25C   Goole on 06/09/1950
25C   Goole 4w/e 09/09/1950
56D   Mirfield w/e 20/06/1959
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 15/03/1947
ALLOC 25C Goole on 06/09/1950
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204
11/12/1966 Crewe Works (Erecting shop) Erecting shop-44672, 45092, 70013/4, 90243/81/300, 92009/203/220, 60007/10, D319, D339, D1111, D1585, D1607/15/21/2/3/9, D1701/28/39/67/77/8/85/8/93, D8005, E3014/6/22/3/6/34/5/45, E26038/52, E27003/6, E5015/6. Paint shop area-44665/889, 90081/362, E3001/15/36, D239, D375, D1107/8/10, D1523, D1662, D1954, D5709. Diesel shop-D214/24, D364/81. D1509/15/21/4/35, D1600/56, D1700, D1842, D1901/49/81, D5718. Electric shop-E26029/50, E3171, D1618. Test area-D1109, D1691, D1864, D5717. Traverser area-D322, D251, D1722/89, D1860, D1942, E3002/29, D5715, 60026, 71000, 90664. Old cutting up shop-D5704. Side of Works-70017, 45138, 90345/406, E3089, D5710. SLS/196701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7433
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25160
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77433    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90300    
06/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90300    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev