Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7434 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77434 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90301 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25161
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/09/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
36A   Doncaster w/e 02/06/1951
36A   Doncaster 5w/e 23/06/1951
41F   Mexborough 4w/e 19/07/1958
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 07/05/1960
41H   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 16/01/1965
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 26/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 31/05/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 27/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 02/06/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 26/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204
18/01/1964 Darlington MPD (Stored) Stored: 46415/73, 61004/255, 63441, 65852/64/91, 68024, 69020, 90100/249/301/655. Ex Works 73138, 75052/58, 90149. Repair Shops Under Light Repairs: 42477, 62059, 63347, 90011. Visitor on Enthusiast Special: 70000. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7434
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25161
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77434    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90301    
02/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
26/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90301    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev