Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 851 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2532 Week
» 22825 Month
» 200729 Year
» 1866105 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7435 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77435 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3041 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63041 w/e 11/12/1948
British Railways 90041 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25162
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Service Life 22 yrs , 11 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1967 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
62C   Dunfermline Upper 5w/e 30/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK EFD Eastfield w/e 09/03/1946
ALLOC DFU Dunfermline Upper 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 62C Dunfermline Upper 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704
15/11/1947 Eastfield MPD On 15/11 No. 1255 was observed here with the wrong Maker's Plate (26157/47), while on 23/11 No. 1256 was seen with the same plates: Nos. 1255 and 1258 were both without plates on 23/11. On 7/12 No. 1067 KIT, which had been repainted green, was seen at Cowlairs West Junction being hauled from Cowlairs Works to Eastfield by 'J.83' No. 8475. On 17/12 No. 1244 Strang Steel HAY was here, being ex Cowlairs Works that day, after having had the nameplates fitted. This is believed to be the first Scottish Area 'B.1' to receive nameplates. On 1/1 No. 1243 EFD was noted here fitted with nameplates-Sir Harold Mitchell. The size of the letters appears to be smaller than that previously used, being between 21' and 3' high. Perhaps the most interesting 'foreigners' on the shed here on the same day were: Nos. 3041 ABD, 3137 HTN and 3190 TWD, the latter carrying both TWD and HTN on the buffer-beam. Nos. 77312 STM and 77313 THJ have been noted here recently, both carrying L.M.S. 15A shed plates, as well as their L.N.E. sheds stencilled or painted on the buffer-beam. Both these engines were regular visitors to Glasgow during the war-but on the L.M.S.-when working from 12A. It is very rare for N.E. Area Class '0.7's' or W.D.'s to appear at Eastfield. SLS/194802

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7435
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25162
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77435    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3041    
11/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63041    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90041    
30/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90041    
04/1967 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev