Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 119 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3632 Week
» 23925 Month
» 201829 Year
» 1867205 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7436 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77436 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90302 w/e 30/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25294
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Tue 18/08/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 20/08/1955
     Withdrawn on 18/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 03/10/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   on 18/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204
10/01/1965 Doncaster MPD (Awaiting works or stored) Awaiting works or stored: 60114/128/157/8, 62037/40/51/5, 63906, 90302/469, 92169/70/5. SLS/196502

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7436
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25294
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77436    
30/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90302    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
18/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90302    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev