Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7437 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77437 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3042 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63042 w/e 09/10/1948
British Railways 90042 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25295
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 10/01/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 24/10/1953
31B   March 4w/e 22/09/1956
33B   Tilbury w/e 30/01/1960
36A   Doncaster w/e 01/07/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 10/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MAR March on 29/11/1946
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   w/e 10/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/01/1965 Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. SLS/196503
07/03/1965 Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. SLS/196504
04/04/1965 Doncaster Works (Stored) Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7437
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25295
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77437    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3042    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63042    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90042    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
01/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
10/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90042    
04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev