Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 842 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2523 Week
» 22816 Month
» 200720 Year
» 1866096 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7439 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77439 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90303 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25297
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Arnott Young (Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
CLK   Colwick w/e 13/08/1949
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK IMM Immingham on 19/02/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 13/08/1949
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7439
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25297
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77439    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90303    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90303    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Avonmour Ironworks, Bilston    

prev prev