Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 574 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18377 Week
» 71393 Month
» 190920 Year
» 3217773 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7440 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
War Dept. |
77440 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90304 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
20/08/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
36B |
Mexborough |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
5w/e |
09/12/1961 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
2w/e |
23/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/09/1964 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7440 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25298 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77440 |
|
|
08/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (COL) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90304 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
07/09/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90304 |
|
|
01/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|