Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 840 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2521 Week
» 22814 Month
» 200718 Year
» 1866094 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7442 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77442 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90306 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25300
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/06/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
64A   St Margarets 4w/e 25/11/1950
64A   St Margarets m/e 30/11/1950
24A   Accrington w/e 01/09/1951
24A   Accrington 4w/e 08/09/1951
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1952
26E   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
26B   Agecroft w/e 07/10/1961
8L   Aintree w/e 10/10/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 08/05/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 27/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DFU Dunfermline Upper on 18/09/1947
ALLOC 64A St Margarets m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 24A Accrington w/e 01/09/1951
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 04/11/1961
ALLOC 8L Aintree w/e 10/10/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 08/05/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   w/e 27/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
05/06/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. SLS/194907
09/07/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. SLS/194908
30/04/1950 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. SLS/195006

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7442
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25300
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77442    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90306    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
01/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
10/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
08/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
27/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90306    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev