Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 27 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 845 Week
» 17796 Month
» 170749 Year
» 1836125 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7443 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77443 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90307 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25301
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 02/12/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC PPRD Pontypool Road m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   w/e 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. SLS/194709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7443
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25301
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77443    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90307    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90307    
06/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev