Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 846 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4359 Week
» 24652 Month
» 202556 Year
» 1867932 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7444 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77444 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90308 m/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25302
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Mon 12/11/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
91M   To London Midland Region 4w/e 17/06/1950
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 23/02/1952
26D   Bury 4w/e 08/08/1953
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 04/12/1954
55G   Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 14/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 12/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN FEL Feltham 5w/e 11/08/1947
LOAN 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 10/06/1950
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 08/08/1953
ALLOC 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 27/11/1954
ALLOC 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 5w/e 04/02/1961
WDN   on 12/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7444
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25302
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77444    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90308    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
04/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (55G)    
12/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90308    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev