Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 796 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4309 Week
» 24602 Month
» 202506 Year
» 1867882 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7445 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77445 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90309 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25303
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Sat 01/07/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 0 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
TDK   Tyne Dock on 29/01/1950
50A   York (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957
55E   Normanton 4w/e 21/09/1957
51A   Darlington w/e 17/06/1961
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 16/03/1963
51A   Darlington w/e 29/06/1963
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
     Withdrawn on 01/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN IMM Immingham on 28/02/1947
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock on 05/10/1947
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock on 29/01/1950
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51A Darlington 5w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 3w/e 02/03/1963
LOAN 66A Polmadie 4w/e 06/03/1963
EXLOAN 51A Darlington 4w/e 06/07/1963
EXLOAN 91NE   5w/e 13/07/1963
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
WDN   on 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7445
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25303
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77445    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
29/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
11/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90309    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
01/07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90309    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev