Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 795 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2476 Week
» 22769 Month
» 200673 Year
» 1866049 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7447 m/e 02/1944
War Dept. 77447 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90310 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25305
To Service During 02/1944
Withdrawal Mon 19/12/1966
Service Life 22 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1944
25E   Sowerby Bridge m/e 16/06/1956
56F   Low Moor w/e 29/12/1962
56D   Mirfield w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 19/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 16/06/1956
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 5w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 5w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 19/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
11/02/1962 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7447
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25305
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77447    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90310    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
29/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
19/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90310    
03/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev