Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 830 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2511 Week
» 22804 Month
» 200708 Year
» 1866084 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7448 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 77448 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3043 on 09/02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63043 w/e 17/07/1948
British Railways 90043 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25306
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 12/12/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 9 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
ANN   Annesley w/e 12/02/1949
CLK   Colwick w/e 14/05/1949
38E   Woodford Halse w/e 29/09/1951
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/10/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 12/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 04/01/1946
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/05/1952
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   w/e 12/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Stripping Shop) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7448
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25306
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77448    
09/02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3043    
17/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63043    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
14/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90043    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
17/05/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
12/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90043    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev