Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 111 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3624 Week
» 23917 Month
» 201821 Year
» 1867197 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7449 m/e 03/1944
War Dept. 77449 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90311 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25307
To Service During 03/1944
Withdrawal Tue 18/08/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1944
41D   Canklow w/e 05/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 18/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 16/10/1947
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   on 18/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 7449
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25307
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77449    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90311    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
18/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90311    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev