Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 198 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3230 Week
» 21282 Month
» 254202 Year
» 1919578 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9776 on 25/03/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 293
To Service Sat 25/03/1936
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/04/1966
Service Life 30 yrs , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/03/1936
BRY   Barry 4w/e 31/12/1949
88B   Cardiff East Dock w/e 31/12/1950
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 31/01/1951
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 13/07/1957
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/09/1957
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/11/1958
2B   Oxley on 17/05/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 16/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 07/09/1957
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 2B Oxley 2w/e 16/05/1964
ALLOC 2B Oxley 5w/e 06/06/1964
WDN   w/e 16/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/03/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9776
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
13/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
07/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
17/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
16/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 9776    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev