Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 787 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4300 Week
» 24593 Month
» 202497 Year
» 1867873 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8510 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 78510 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90363 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25412
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
55E   Normanton 5w/e 20/07/1957
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 08/02/1958
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 25A Wakefield on 30/09/1949
ALLOC 55E Normanton 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 25/01/1958
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. SLS/194709
19/03/1949 Blaydon MPD On 19/3 the following Class '8' 2-8-0 W.D. locomotives were noted: No. 90032, fitted with Gresley type snifting valve, while Nos. 90363, 90652/82/94 were all fitted with G.W.R. type top feed. 'W.D. 2-8-0' was painted in white on the buffer beam. SLS/194905
11/11/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8510
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25412
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78510    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90363    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
08/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90363    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev