Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 780 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4293 Week
» 24586 Month
» 202490 Year
» 1867866 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8512 on 08/09/1944
War Dept. 78512 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90364 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24949
To Service Sun 08/09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/12/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys
Information Received at Swindon ex Harwich, 30/5/1947

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/09/1944
26D   Bury w/e 03/12/1949
26D   Bury 5w/e 24/12/1949
9K   Bolton w/e 21/12/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 26/09/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 16/01/1965
36A   Doncaster w/e 12/06/1965
40B   Immingham w/e 06/11/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 05/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 24B Rose Grove on 12/03/1949
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 3w/e 06/02/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 36A Doncaster 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   on 05/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. SLS/194709
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8512
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24949
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78512    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90364    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
05/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90364    
05/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev