Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 836 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4349 Week
» 24642 Month
» 202546 Year
» 1867922 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8513 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 78513 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3083 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63083 w/e 17/07/1948
British Railways 90083 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24950
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Mon 28/12/1959
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Sun 28/02/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
31B   March 4w/e 22/09/1956
     Withdrawn on 28/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   on 28/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8513
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24950
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78513    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3083    
17/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63083    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90083    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
28/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 90083    
28/02/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev