Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 834 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4347 Week
» 24640 Month
» 202544 Year
» 1867920 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8515 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 78515 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3084 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63084 w/e 04/09/1948
British Railways 90084 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25413
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 06/06/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 16/01/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 06/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CLK Colwick on 08/12/1945
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 06/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8515
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25413
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78515    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3084    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63084    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90084    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
06/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90084    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev