Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 101 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3614 Week
» 23907 Month
» 201811 Year
» 1867187 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 8516 m/e 09/1944
War Dept. 78516 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3085 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63085 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90085 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25414
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 16/05/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
COL   Colchester w/e 24/04/1948
31B   March 4w/e 20/10/1951
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 14/02/1953
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 17/11/1956
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 27/02/1960
41D   Canklow w/e 26/03/1960
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 16/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/03/1960
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 16/04/1960
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   w/e 16/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/10/1965 Doncaster Shed (Stored) Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. SLS/196511

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 8516
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25414
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 78516    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3085    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63085 but not taken up    
24/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90085    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
16/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90085    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev