Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 767 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2448 Week
» 22741 Month
» 200645 Year
» 1866021 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78520 m/e 09/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3086 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63086 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90086 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25417
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1963
Service Life 18 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1963 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
SKN   Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
51G   Haverton Hill 4w/e 11/10/1958
51L   Thornaby w/e 20/06/1959
52H   Tyne Dock w/e 16/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 12/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 02/01/1946
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC SKN Stockton w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 51G Haverton Hill 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 14/06/1959
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 31/03/1963
WDN   on 12/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78520
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25417
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3086    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63086 but not taken up    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (SKN)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90086    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
12/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90086    
10/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev