Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 886 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1904 Week
» 2843 Month
» 206333 Year
» 1871709 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78521 m/e 09/1944
British Railways 90366 m/e 06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25418
To Service During 09/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/01/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1944
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/08/1950
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/08/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 18/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/07/1947
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common m/e 31/08/1947
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/08/1950
LOAN 26A Newton Heath m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 13/08/1955
WDN   w/e 18/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during July included:-Nos. 1019, 2532, 2841, 2852, 2931, 2936, 2939, 2943, 3831, 3862, 4032, 4074, 4083, 5005, 5030, 5357, 5936, 5942, 5990, 6317, 6345, 6360, 6395, W.D. 77294, 78542 and 78632. No. 2651 WOS was ex Works on 5/7. New engines reported seen are:-Nos. 4155 BRD, 4156 STJ and 6753-55 CV.BRY. - The following have received 'TF' boilers: Nos. 1410, 3790, 4630, 6405, 8756, and 9707. 'Austerity' Nos. 77000, 77443, 78510, 78512, 78521, and 79235 are all ex repairs in Belgium and painted black. The new 67XX are the same as the earlier ones, in that they are not fitted with screw couplings, train heating, vacuum brake or A.T.C. equipment. They are, however, fitted with 'TF' boilers. SLS/194709
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78521
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25418
   
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90366    
18/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90366    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev