Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 769 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4282 Week
» 24575 Month
» 202479 Year
» 1867855 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78522 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90367 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25419
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 27/02/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys
Information Received ex Crewe LMS after repairs, 19/4/1947.
Engine History sheet has built date as 27/1/1945.

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
CLK   Colwick w/e 28/08/1948
NWE   New England w/e 18/09/1948
24F   Fleetwood w/e 10/02/1962
26C   Bolton w/e 20/04/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 03/10/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 09/01/1965
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 12/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 25/12/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN PDN Old Oak Common m/e 30/04/1947
LOAN RDG Reading (S.R.) m/e 31/05/1947
LOAN NWE New England on 21/03/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/08/1948
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/09/1948
LOAN PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 27/11/1948
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall on 14/04/1949
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 26C Bolton 5w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 12/06/1965
LOAN 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 6w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   w/e 27/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78522
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25419
   
28/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90367    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
20/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
12/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
25/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
27/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90367    
07/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev