Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 855 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4368 Week
» 24661 Month
» 202565 Year
» 1867941 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78525 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90368 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25422
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 20/06/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1965 at Arnott Young (Parkgate)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
41D   Canklow w/e 12/09/1959
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN IMM Immingham on 23/05/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 29/06/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 9w/e 08/02/1964
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton MPD On Shed ex-Works : 63704/64, 90293/305/68. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78525
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25422
   
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90368    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
20/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90368    
09/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate    

prev prev