Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78526 m/e 10/1944
British Railways 90369 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25423
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
YK   York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 12/07/1952
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 19/07/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 06/09/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 20/09/1952
2E   Northampton 4w/e 24/04/1954
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 20/04/1957
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 15/09/1962
24L   Carnforth w/e 16/03/1963
16D   Nottingham w/e 21/12/1963
10A   Carnforth w/e 18/04/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 25/04/1964
36A   Doncaster w/e 12/09/1964
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill on 16/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 2E Northampton 4w/e 17/04/1954
ALLOC LMMPA   4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 24L Carnforth 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 2w/e 12/09/1964
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78526
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25423
   
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90369    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Northampton (2E)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (24L)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
12/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90369    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev