Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 848 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4361 Week
» 24654 Month
» 202558 Year
» 1867934 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78528 m/e 10/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3090 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63090 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90090 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25426
To Service During 10/1944
Withdrawal Thu 30/05/1963
Service Life 18 yrs , 8 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1963 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1944
NPT   Newport (Teeside) w/e 04/12/1948
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
52H   Tyne Dock w/e 16/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 30/05/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 52H Tyne Dock 4w/e 31/03/1963
WDN   on 30/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
31/12/1946 General The following 2-8-0 Austerity engines were taken in to Scottish Area stock as from 28/12/46 and are now, Class O7:- Allocated: Eastfield: 77223, 77498, 77501. St. Margaret's: 70841, 78527/8, 78625/63/64, 78708/11, 79177. Thornton: 70816/30, 77033, 77360/7, 78655/68, 78702/13. Dundee: 70852, 77277, 77505, 78654, 79251. Ferryhill (Aberdeen): 77423/35/87, 78608/41. SLS/194704

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1944 To Service To service as WD Number 78528
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25426
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3090    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63090 but not taken up    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90090    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
16/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H)    
30/05/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90090    
11/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev