Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 845 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4358 Week
» 24651 Month
» 202555 Year
» 1867931 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78531 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90408 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25386
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sat 28/03/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Albert Looms (Spondon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
26D   Bury 8w/e 14/06/1952
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 21/12/1963
9M   Bury w/e 28/03/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 28/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 28/03/1964
ALLOC 9M Bury 4w/e 04/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/03/1950 Brighton Works Locomotives in shops for repair on 20/3 included: Nos. 15203, 31744, 32030/89, 32519/45, 32659, 34081, 36001, ex-W.D. 77098, 77321/79, 77460, 78531, 78666. Under construction Nos. 34106 Lydford (almost ready), 34107-09, and two 2-6-4 tanks. SLS/195004
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
06/05/1950 Brighton Works Latest 'West Country' to 6/5/50 was 34108 Wincanton: new construction includes 34109/10 of the same order, and some 2-6-4T Nos. 42096-102. Engines under repair: 15203, 272, 1295, 1554, 32081, 32417, 32512/64, 32636, 34074, 34021 Dartmoor, 78666/90641, 78531/90408, 77359/90257, 79262/90702. No. 42096 has boiler No. 13474. Following after 42106, further 2-6-4T's will be built with standard cab arrangements, so that Brighton has plenty of work in view. SLS/195006
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78531
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25386
   
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90408    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
28/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90408    
28/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (9M)    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon    

prev prev