Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 21 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1931 Week
» 2870 Month
» 206360 Year
» 1871736 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78532 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90409 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25387
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1967 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
YK   York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
50A   York (North) 5w/e 17/12/1955
51B   Newport (Teeside) 3w/e 16/06/1956
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
56B   Ardsley w/e 23/06/1962
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 17/07/1965
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/09/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 50A York (North) 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 51B Newport (Teeside) 4w/e 23/06/1956
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 17/07/1965
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78532
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25387
   
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90409    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90409    
11/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev