Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 837 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4350 Week
» 24643 Month
» 202547 Year
» 1867923 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78534 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3098 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63098 m/e Not applied
British Railways 90098 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25389
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal Tue 10/11/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1965 at T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (Stockton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1945
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
51A   Darlington w/e 04/05/1963
     Withdrawn on 10/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NPT Newport (Teeside) on 28/11/1945
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 51A Darlington 6w/e 11/05/1963
WDN   on 10/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
19/09/1964 Darlington MPD (Shed) On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. SLS/196410

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78534
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25389
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3098    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 63098 but not taken up    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90098    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
10/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90098    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton    

prev prev