Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 824 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4337 Week
» 24630 Month
» 202534 Year
» 1867910 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78537 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90410 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25392
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
41D   Canklow w/e 07/03/1964
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 19/06/1965
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
36C   Frodingham w/e 13/11/1965
36A   Doncaster w/e 05/03/1966
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 06/03/1947
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 3w/e 27/11/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 12/03/1966
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78537
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25392
   
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90410    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
05/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90410    
09/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev