Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 780 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6180 Week
» 24232 Month
» 257152 Year
» 1922528 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78538 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90411 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25393
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal Tue 18/08/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
YK   York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 13/08/1949
38B   Annesley 4w/e 20/01/1951
38B   Annesley m/e 31/01/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 30/06/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 21/07/1951
38E   Woodford Halse w/e 29/09/1951
38E   Woodford Halse 4w/e 20/10/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 19/04/1952
31B   March 4w/e 23/01/1954
38A   Colwick 5w/e 24/04/1954
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
41D   Canklow w/e 20/06/1959
40B   Immingham w/e 12/09/1959
41D   Canklow w/e 09/01/1960
41J   Langwith Junction w/e 13/08/1960
     Withdrawn on 18/08/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill on 11/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 30/06/1951
ALLOC 38E Woodford Halse w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 41D Canklow 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 03/09/1960
WDN   on 18/08/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78538
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25393
   
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90411    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
30/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
20/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
13/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
18/08/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90411    
11/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev