Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 63 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4978 Week
» 16215 Month
» 249135 Year
» 1914511 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78540 m/e 02/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3099 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63099 w/e 03/04/1948
British Railways 90099 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25395
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal Sat 24/06/1967
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
YK   York (North) w/e 12/02/1949
53A   Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 22/09/1951
50D   Goole w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 24/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HLS Hull Springhead on 27/03/1946
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 20/04/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 24/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78540
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25395
   
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3099    
03/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63099    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90099    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
24/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90099    
01/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev