Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 818 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4331 Week
» 24624 Month
» 202528 Year
» 1867904 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 78541 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90412 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25396
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal Mon 26/10/1964
Service Life 19 yrs, 8 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1945
25E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 24/03/1956
56A   Wakefield w/e 14/09/1963
     Withdrawn on 26/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield w/e 14/09/1963
WDN   on 26/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/04/1947 Stonor Dump 70200 was still at Stonor 'dump' on 29/4 and on the same day 77092, 78541 and 78551 were on Dover shed. SLS/194706
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 78541
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25396
   
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90412    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
26/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90412    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell    

prev prev